Daily Law Journal

Case Information

8/14/2019
18CVE04017
Kettering Municipal Assignments

RIDGELEIGH WOODS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION
MASONRY RESTORATION TECHNOLOGIES & SERVICES, LLC

JAMES LONG

Docket History

7/30/2019

7/30/2019

5/21/2019

2/1/2019

2/1/2019

12/20/2018