Daily Law Journal

Case Information

8/15/2019
17CVF03647
Kettering Municipal Assignments

AM TOOLING, LLC 
NEXT-LIFT INC 

FREDERICK DRESSEL

Docket History

5/21/2019

4/23/2019

1/29/2019

11/13/2018

6/19/2018

6/19/2018

6/19/2018

6/19/2018

6/19/2018

6/19/2018

6/19/2018

6/19/2018