Daily Law Journal

Case Information

2/11/2025
17CVF01919
Dayton Municipal

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc
Robert Florence III
Motion Hearing

Christopher D Roberts
James Colabianchi, JR of Portfolio Recovery Associates, Inc.

Docket History

1/7/2025
60 B Hearing

12/10/2024
Garnishment Hearing

11/18/2024
Motion To Vacate Judgment

10/29/2024
Garnishment Hearing

7/18/2024
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Revived Judgment