Daily Law Journal

Case Information

3/18/2025
12CVF06680
Dayton Municipal

Rodney Ramey
Deanna Freeze
Citation In Contempt

Franklin W Gehres
Jacob A Kovach of J A Kovach Law Co., L P A

Docket History

1/28/2025
Debtor's Exam

1/27/2025
Motion For Continuance

11/5/2024
Revivor Judgement Hearing

11/5/2024
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Revived Judgment

9/17/2024
Answer