27788 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVG1301197 | IVY, CASSIUS | 9/9/2013 | |||||||
GARDEN WOODS APTS. vs IVY, CASSIUS | |||||||||
CVG1301198 | NEWMAN, MONA | 9/9/2013 | |||||||
GARDEN WOODS APTS. vs NEWMAN, MONA | |||||||||
CVG1301199 | WYNN, LOUIS | 9/9/2013 | |||||||
KINGSLEY LTD vs WYNN, LOUIS | |||||||||
CVG1301200 | BROWN, GWENDOLYN | 9/9/2013 | |||||||
KINGSLEY LTD vs BROWN, GWENDOLYN | |||||||||
CVG1301201 | WALTERS, JENNIFER | 9/9/2013 | |||||||
B&L ENTERPRISES vs WALTERS, JENNIFER | |||||||||
CVG1301202 | DAVIS, BRITTANY | 9/9/2013 | |||||||
NOTTINGHAM ESTATES vs DAVIS, BRITTANY | |||||||||
CVG1301196 | COMBS, CARLOS | 9/9/2013 | |||||||
GARDEN WOODS APTS. vs COMBS, CARLOS | |||||||||
CVG1301191 | DAVIS, JACQUELINE | 9/6/2013 | |||||||
RSB INVESTMENTS, LLC DBA RSBI ENTERPRISES vs DAVIS, JACQUELINE | |||||||||
CVH1301192 | PEEP ZEE REALITY | 9/6/2013 | |||||||
SIMMONS, TERRY vs PEEP ZEE REALITY | |||||||||
CVG1301190 | ELLIOTT, ROBERT | 9/5/2013 | |||||||
HEINDL, LARRY vs ELLIOTT, ROBERT | |||||||||
CVG1301185 | SURBAUGH, DAVID | 9/4/2013 | |||||||
COUNTY CORP. INC. vs SURBAUGH, DAVID | |||||||||
CVG1301189 | BACK, STEPHANIE | 9/4/2013 | |||||||
GREMLING, CHRIS vs BACK, STEPHANIE | |||||||||
CVH1301188 | MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | 9/4/2013 | |||||||
ARNETT, JON vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | |||||||||
CVG1301187 | NAPIER, FRANCIS JAMES | 9/4/2013 | |||||||
BOGGESS, LARRY vs NAPIER, FRANCIS JAMES | |||||||||
CVF1301186 | EDWARDS, ALEXANDER | 9/4/2013 | |||||||
BAILEY, KALESHA vs EDWARDS, ALEXANDER | |||||||||
CVG1301179 | WHITE, BEATRICE | 9/3/2013 | |||||||
WILSON, BARTON L. vs WHITE, BEATRICE | |||||||||
CVG1301180 | DYKES, RUTH N. | 9/3/2013 | |||||||
WILSON, BARTON L. vs DYKES, RUTH N. | |||||||||
CVF1301181 | BERGER, JASON | 9/3/2013 | |||||||
ABBEY CREDIT UNION, INC. vs BERGER, JASON | |||||||||
CVF1301182 | EATON, ELIZABETH | 9/3/2013 | |||||||
CACH, LLC vs EATON, ELIZABETH | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 1358, 1359, 1360 ... 1388, 1389, 1390 Next |