27788 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVG1301225 | WALKER, JASMINE | 9/16/2013 | |||||||
NORTHLAND VILLAGE APTS. vs WALKER, JASMINE | |||||||||
CVG1301216 | BURNS, MARTHA R | 9/13/2013 | |||||||
PEASE, RANDALL S vs BURNS, MARTHA R | |||||||||
CVI1301217 | BOCKO, BOB | 9/13/2013 | |||||||
MCGUIRE, TRACI vs BOCKO, BOB | |||||||||
CVG1301218 | CLAY, TERRY | 9/13/2013 | |||||||
LSRK MANAGEMENT vs CLAY, TERRY | |||||||||
CVG1301213 | CAMPBELL, LESTER | 9/12/2013 | |||||||
CHATEAU APARTMENTS vs CAMPBELL, LESTER | |||||||||
CVG1301215 | MCLAIN, BRADLEY | 9/12/2013 | |||||||
RIVERVIEW PARK APARTMENTS vs MCLAIN, BRADLEY | |||||||||
CVG1301214 | BLAKES, LINDA A. | 9/12/2013 | |||||||
THOMAS, JOANI vs BLAKES, LINDA A. | |||||||||
CVG1301212 | ABRAMS, MARGARET | 9/12/2013 | |||||||
CHATEAU APARTMENTS vs ABRAMS, MARGARET | |||||||||
CVG1301211 | MORTEN, JAY | 9/12/2013 | |||||||
KROEKER, ROBERT vs MORTEN, JAY | |||||||||
CVG1301210 | BRYANT, KIARA | 9/12/2013 | |||||||
FURLONG, WILLIAM J. vs BRYANT, KIARA | |||||||||
CVG1301209 | HEYS, VALERIE | 9/12/2013 | |||||||
THE VINEYARDS APARTMENTS vs HEYS, VALERIE | |||||||||
CVF1301208 | PEASANT, JULIAN S. III | 9/12/2013 | |||||||
ABBEY CREDIT UNION, INC. vs PEASANT, JULIAN S. III | |||||||||
CVE1301207 | LEMKE, THOMAS | 9/12/2013 | |||||||
SAFE AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY vs LEMKE, THOMAS | |||||||||
CVF1301204 | BOHL, CARMEN | 9/11/2013 | |||||||
CBCS vs BOHL, CARMEN | |||||||||
CVG1301205 | GOODER, ANITA | 9/11/2013 | |||||||
ELSA PROPERTY LLC vs GOODER, ANITA | |||||||||
CVG1301206 | HARRIS, KANEISHA | 9/11/2013 | |||||||
COLE, TERRELL vs HARRIS, KANEISHA | |||||||||
CVG1301203 | LAWLER, JASON | 9/10/2013 | |||||||
ST. MICHAEL INVESTMENTS, LLC vs LAWLER, JASON | |||||||||
CVF1301193 | MALOTT, NATHAN M. | 9/9/2013 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., INC ASSIGNEE OF MBNA vs MALOTT, NATHAN M. | |||||||||
CVF1301194 | MCGC GOLF, LLC C/O STEVE LAMBERT, STAT. AGT. | 9/9/2013 | |||||||
ADVANCED TURF SOLUTIONS vs MCGC GOLF, LLC C/O STEVE LAMBERT, STAT. AGT. | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 1357, 1358, 1359 ... 1388, 1389, 1390 Next |