27855 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVF1400826 | SMITH, CHERRY | 5/28/2014 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs SMITH, CHERRY | |||||||||
CVF1400825 | BRANDENBERG, MICHELLE | 5/28/2014 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs BRANDENBERG, MICHELLE | |||||||||
CVH1400795 | RANKIN, MIKE | 5/27/2014 | |||||||
MCGUIRE, TYRANS vs RANKIN, MIKE | |||||||||
CVF1400796 | HARMAN, JAMIE M | 5/27/2014 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC vs HARMAN, JAMIE M | |||||||||
CVF1400797 | EVANS, TAMARA | 5/27/2014 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs EVANS, TAMARA | |||||||||
CVH1400798 | MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | 5/27/2014 | |||||||
ARRONE, LAMONT E. vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | |||||||||
CVG1400799 | AMBROGI, JUSTIN J. | 5/27/2014 | |||||||
SUE MALOTT, MANAGER RE/MAX ALLIANCE REALTY vs AMBROGI, JUSTIN J. | |||||||||
CVG1400800 | WEAVER, BRITTANY | 5/27/2014 | |||||||
NORTHLAND VILLAGE APTS. vs WEAVER, BRITTANY | |||||||||
CVG1400801 | PAGE, CHANTE | 5/27/2014 | |||||||
NORTHLAND VILLAGE APTS. vs PAGE, CHANTE | |||||||||
CVG1400802 | KUHN, ROBERT | 5/27/2014 | |||||||
BLUE CHIP BROTHERS LTD. vs KUHN, ROBERT | |||||||||
CVH1400790 | RANKIN, MIKE | 5/23/2014 | |||||||
CHATMAN, BETTY vs RANKIN, MIKE | |||||||||
CVE1400794 | SAMS, JOSHUA O. | 5/23/2014 | |||||||
HOME-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY vs SAMS, JOSHUA O. | |||||||||
CVF1400793 | BELL, JOSHUA W. | 5/23/2014 | |||||||
STERLING JEWELERS INC. vs BELL, JOSHUA W. | |||||||||
CVF1400792 | SLOAS, PATSY | 5/23/2014 | |||||||
GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK vs SLOAS, PATSY | |||||||||
CVI1400791 | BMS GLASS | 5/23/2014 | |||||||
CARFORA, RADA vs BMS GLASS | |||||||||
CVG1400787 | SMITH, CECIL | 5/22/2014 | |||||||
ELON PROPERTY MANAGEMENT vs SMITH, CECIL | |||||||||
CVI1400788 | M3 MARKETING AND GSA SERVICES | 5/22/2014 | |||||||
NATIONAL ALLIANCE SECURITY AGENCY, INC vs M3 MARKETING AND GSA SERVICES | |||||||||
CVI1400789 | DESUTTER, KERR AND ASSOCIATS | 5/22/2014 | |||||||
NATIONAL ALLIANCE SECURITY AGENCY INC vs DESUTTER, KERR AND ASSOCIATS | |||||||||
CVI1400785 | EVAN'S ARENA | 5/21/2014 | |||||||
JOHNSON, ANTOINETTE D. vs EVAN'S ARENA | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 1287, 1288, 1289 ... 1391, 1392, 1393 Next |