27788 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVG1400801 | PAGE, CHANTE | 5/27/2014 | |||||||
NORTHLAND VILLAGE APTS. vs PAGE, CHANTE | |||||||||
CVG1400802 | KUHN, ROBERT | 5/27/2014 | |||||||
BLUE CHIP BROTHERS LTD. vs KUHN, ROBERT | |||||||||
CVG1400800 | WEAVER, BRITTANY | 5/27/2014 | |||||||
NORTHLAND VILLAGE APTS. vs WEAVER, BRITTANY | |||||||||
CVH1400790 | RANKIN, MIKE | 5/23/2014 | |||||||
CHATMAN, BETTY vs RANKIN, MIKE | |||||||||
CVI1400791 | BMS GLASS | 5/23/2014 | |||||||
CARFORA, RADA vs BMS GLASS | |||||||||
CVF1400792 | SLOAS, PATSY | 5/23/2014 | |||||||
GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK vs SLOAS, PATSY | |||||||||
CVF1400793 | BELL, JOSHUA W. | 5/23/2014 | |||||||
STERLING JEWELERS INC. vs BELL, JOSHUA W. | |||||||||
CVE1400794 | SAMS, JOSHUA O. | 5/23/2014 | |||||||
HOME-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY vs SAMS, JOSHUA O. | |||||||||
CVI1400789 | DESUTTER, KERR AND ASSOCIATS | 5/22/2014 | |||||||
NATIONAL ALLIANCE SECURITY AGENCY INC vs DESUTTER, KERR AND ASSOCIATS | |||||||||
CVI1400788 | M3 MARKETING AND GSA SERVICES | 5/22/2014 | |||||||
NATIONAL ALLIANCE SECURITY AGENCY, INC vs M3 MARKETING AND GSA SERVICES | |||||||||
CVG1400787 | SMITH, CECIL | 5/22/2014 | |||||||
ELON PROPERTY MANAGEMENT vs SMITH, CECIL | |||||||||
CVI1400785 | EVAN'S ARENA | 5/21/2014 | |||||||
JOHNSON, ANTOINETTE D. vs EVAN'S ARENA | |||||||||
CVH1400786 | MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | 5/21/2014 | |||||||
LITTLE, JOSHUA M. vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | |||||||||
CVG1400778 | WILSON, LONNIE | 5/20/2014 | |||||||
THOMAS, JOANI vs WILSON, LONNIE | |||||||||
CVG1400779 | WILLIAMSON, ROBYNN | 5/20/2014 | |||||||
OBERER MANAGEMENT SERVICES vs WILLIAMSON, ROBYNN | |||||||||
CVG1400780 | WOODS, KYLA | 5/20/2014 | |||||||
MEADOWS OF CATALPA vs WOODS, KYLA | |||||||||
CVG1400781 | OWENS, FLORENCE | 5/20/2014 | |||||||
MEADOWS OF CATALPA vs OWENS, FLORENCE | |||||||||
CVG1400782 | KIRCHGESSNER, MICHELLE | 5/20/2014 | |||||||
ROGERS, SHERRILYN vs KIRCHGESSNER, MICHELLE | |||||||||
CVG1400783 | YOUNG, KATINA | 5/20/2014 | |||||||
DICK, KAMA L. vs YOUNG, KATINA | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 1284, 1285, 1286 ... 1388, 1389, 1390 Next |