26048 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVG1301051 | WAMPLER, JEREMY | 8/5/2013 | |||||||
NOTTINGHAM ESTATES vs WAMPLER, JEREMY | |||||||||
CVG1301052 | COOK, BARRY | 8/5/2013 | |||||||
KINGSLEY LTD DBA STILLWATER PARK APARTMENTS vs COOK, BARRY | |||||||||
CVG1301053 | TAYLOR, DANIELLA | 8/5/2013 | |||||||
HAROLD, LLC vs TAYLOR, DANIELLA | |||||||||
CVG1301050 | NEAL, ROGER | 8/5/2013 | |||||||
NOTTINGHAM ESTATES vs NEAL, ROGER | |||||||||
CVF1301037 | HRICKO, ROSEMARY | 8/2/2013 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs HRICKO, ROSEMARY | |||||||||
CVF1301038 | PORTER, ERICA | 8/2/2013 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs PORTER, ERICA | |||||||||
CVF1301039 | ACHS, SHAWN | 8/2/2013 | |||||||
CACH, LLC vs ACHS, SHAWN | |||||||||
CVF1301040 | UNDERWOOD, NICOLE | 8/2/2013 | |||||||
CREDIT INVESTMENTS, INC. C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs UNDERWOOD, NICOLE | |||||||||
CVF1301041 | SIVILS, JESSICA ANN | 8/2/2013 | |||||||
CREDIT INVESTMENTS, INC. C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs SIVILS, JESSICA ANN | |||||||||
CVI1301042 | BILPUCH, PEGGY | 8/2/2013 | |||||||
HARLAMERT-DAUGH, DEBRA S. vs BILPUCH, PEGGY | |||||||||
CVI1301034 | YOUNG, REGGIE | 8/1/2013 | |||||||
MUHAMMED, KEVIN J. vs YOUNG, REGGIE | |||||||||
CVH1301036 | MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | 8/1/2013 | |||||||
BOHANNON, CASEY vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | |||||||||
CVF1301035 | SAMUELS, DEBBIE | 8/1/2013 | |||||||
STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE CO. vs SAMUELS, DEBBIE | |||||||||
CVG1301029 | FLETCHER, CHRISTOPHER | 7/31/2013 | |||||||
GARDEN WOODS APTS. vs FLETCHER, CHRISTOPHER | |||||||||
CVG1301030 | WARREN, GERALD | 7/31/2013 | |||||||
GARDEN WOODS APTS. vs WARREN, GERALD | |||||||||
CVG1301031 | HUNTSMAN, MISTEE | 7/31/2013 | |||||||
NORTHLAND VILLAGE APTS. vs HUNTSMAN, MISTEE | |||||||||
CVI1301032 | RINEHART, PATRICK JR. | 7/31/2013 | |||||||
STRAHORN, DERRICK vs RINEHART, PATRICK JR. | |||||||||
CVI1301033 | CAIN, CYNDI | 7/31/2013 | |||||||
STRAHORN, DERRICK vs CAIN, CYNDI | |||||||||
CVF1301028 | OCHSENBEIN, KAREN | 7/30/2013 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO INC vs OCHSENBEIN, KAREN | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 1277, 1278, 1279 ... 1301, 1302, 1303 Next |