26048 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVG1301189 | BACK, STEPHANIE | 9/4/2013 | |||||||
GREMLING, CHRIS vs BACK, STEPHANIE | |||||||||
CVH1301188 | MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | 9/4/2013 | |||||||
ARNETT, JON vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | |||||||||
CVG1301179 | WHITE, BEATRICE | 9/3/2013 | |||||||
WILSON, BARTON L. vs WHITE, BEATRICE | |||||||||
CVG1301180 | DYKES, RUTH N. | 9/3/2013 | |||||||
WILSON, BARTON L. vs DYKES, RUTH N. | |||||||||
CVF1301181 | BERGER, JASON | 9/3/2013 | |||||||
ABBEY CREDIT UNION, INC. vs BERGER, JASON | |||||||||
CVF1301182 | EATON, ELIZABETH | 9/3/2013 | |||||||
CACH, LLC vs EATON, ELIZABETH | |||||||||
CVI1301183 | ADAMS, DENNIS | 9/3/2013 | |||||||
PHILLIPS, MEGAN A vs ADAMS, DENNIS | |||||||||
CVF1301184 | LAMBDIN, ANNETTE | 9/3/2013 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs LAMBDIN, ANNETTE | |||||||||
CVI1301178 | MESSER, KANDISS | 8/30/2013 | |||||||
NEY, BARBARA A vs MESSER, KANDISS | |||||||||
CVG1301177 | HAIRSTON, DERRICK | 8/30/2013 | |||||||
RICHMOND, JEFFERY G. vs HAIRSTON, DERRICK | |||||||||
CVF1301176 | SUMMERS, JENNIFER | 8/30/2013 | |||||||
CYPRESS FINANCIAL vs SUMMERS, JENNIFER | |||||||||
CVI1301172 | KYLE, RAYMOND | 8/29/2013 | |||||||
DDK FINANCIAL ASSOCIATES, LLC vs KYLE, RAYMOND | |||||||||
CVI1301173 | BAKER, SHANNON | 8/29/2013 | |||||||
DDK FINANCIAL ASSOCIATES, LLC vs BAKER, SHANNON | |||||||||
CVF1301174 | ECKLEY, LAUREN M. | 8/29/2013 | |||||||
WRIGHT STATE UNIVERSITY C/O STATE OF OHIO vs ECKLEY, LAUREN M. | |||||||||
CVF1301175 | STAMPER, STEPHANIE | 8/29/2013 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DOING BUSINESS IN OHIO AS vs STAMPER, STEPHANIE | |||||||||
CVH1301151 | MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | 8/28/2013 | |||||||
REYNOLDS, DAVINA J. vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | |||||||||
CVH1301152 | RANKIN, MIKE | 8/28/2013 | |||||||
BACH, MATHICLA vs RANKIN, MIKE | |||||||||
CVF1301153 | HUELSMAN, MARY | 8/28/2013 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DOING BUSINESS IN OHIO AS vs HUELSMAN, MARY | |||||||||
CVF1301154 | SMITH, ROBERT | 8/28/2013 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DOING BUSINESS IN OHIO AS vs SMITH, ROBERT | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 1270, 1271, 1272 ... 1301, 1302, 1303 Next |