26048 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVG1301205 | GOODER, ANITA | 9/11/2013 | |||||||
ELSA PROPERTY LLC vs GOODER, ANITA | |||||||||
CVG1301206 | HARRIS, KANEISHA | 9/11/2013 | |||||||
COLE, TERRELL vs HARRIS, KANEISHA | |||||||||
CVF1301204 | BOHL, CARMEN | 9/11/2013 | |||||||
CBCS vs BOHL, CARMEN | |||||||||
CVG1301203 | LAWLER, JASON | 9/10/2013 | |||||||
ST. MICHAEL INVESTMENTS, LLC vs LAWLER, JASON | |||||||||
CVG1301199 | WYNN, LOUIS | 9/9/2013 | |||||||
KINGSLEY LTD vs WYNN, LOUIS | |||||||||
CVG1301202 | DAVIS, BRITTANY | 9/9/2013 | |||||||
NOTTINGHAM ESTATES vs DAVIS, BRITTANY | |||||||||
CVG1301201 | WALTERS, JENNIFER | 9/9/2013 | |||||||
B&L ENTERPRISES vs WALTERS, JENNIFER | |||||||||
CVG1301200 | BROWN, GWENDOLYN | 9/9/2013 | |||||||
KINGSLEY LTD vs BROWN, GWENDOLYN | |||||||||
CVG1301198 | NEWMAN, MONA | 9/9/2013 | |||||||
GARDEN WOODS APTS. vs NEWMAN, MONA | |||||||||
CVG1301197 | IVY, CASSIUS | 9/9/2013 | |||||||
GARDEN WOODS APTS. vs IVY, CASSIUS | |||||||||
CVG1301196 | COMBS, CARLOS | 9/9/2013 | |||||||
GARDEN WOODS APTS. vs COMBS, CARLOS | |||||||||
CVG1301195 | HARRIS, TONY | 9/9/2013 | |||||||
5610 NORTH MAIN, LLC vs HARRIS, TONY | |||||||||
CVF1301194 | MCGC GOLF, LLC C/O STEVE LAMBERT, STAT. AGT. | 9/9/2013 | |||||||
ADVANCED TURF SOLUTIONS vs MCGC GOLF, LLC C/O STEVE LAMBERT, STAT. AGT. | |||||||||
CVF1301193 | MALOTT, NATHAN M. | 9/9/2013 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., INC ASSIGNEE OF MBNA vs MALOTT, NATHAN M. | |||||||||
CVG1301191 | DAVIS, JACQUELINE | 9/6/2013 | |||||||
RSB INVESTMENTS, LLC DBA RSBI ENTERPRISES vs DAVIS, JACQUELINE | |||||||||
CVH1301192 | PEEP ZEE REALITY | 9/6/2013 | |||||||
SIMMONS, TERRY vs PEEP ZEE REALITY | |||||||||
CVG1301190 | ELLIOTT, ROBERT | 9/5/2013 | |||||||
HEINDL, LARRY vs ELLIOTT, ROBERT | |||||||||
CVG1301185 | SURBAUGH, DAVID | 9/4/2013 | |||||||
COUNTY CORP. INC. vs SURBAUGH, DAVID | |||||||||
CVF1301186 | EDWARDS, ALEXANDER | 9/4/2013 | |||||||
BAILEY, KALESHA vs EDWARDS, ALEXANDER | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 1269, 1270, 1271 ... 1301, 1302, 1303 Next |