27855 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVF1401971 | GRIFFIN, DAVID | 12/10/2014 | |||||||
SPRINGLEAF FINANCIAL SERVICES OF OHIO, INC. vs GRIFFIN, DAVID | |||||||||
CVF1401970 | GRANT-HOLMES, MONA J. | 12/10/2014 | |||||||
SPRINGLEAF FINANCIAL SERVICES OF OHIO, INC. vs GRANT-HOLMES, MONA J. | |||||||||
CVH1401958 | MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES | 12/9/2014 | |||||||
CASEY, MADONNA vs MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES | |||||||||
CVF1401966 | DAUGHTERY, RAYMOND L. | 12/9/2014 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs DAUGHTERY, RAYMOND L. | |||||||||
CVF1401964 | WALLS, LAMOURA M. | 12/8/2014 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs WALLS, LAMOURA M. | |||||||||
CVF1401965 | STEWART, JASON | 12/8/2014 | |||||||
CITY OF CLAYTON, OHIO vs STEWART, JASON | |||||||||
CVH1401963 | MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | 12/8/2014 | |||||||
FAUSEY, JUSTIN vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | |||||||||
CVG1401962 | JONES, LARRY | 12/8/2014 | |||||||
NOTTINGHAM ESTATES vs JONES, LARRY | |||||||||
CVG1401961 | BAUMGARDNER, JESSICA | 12/8/2014 | |||||||
NOTTINGHAM ESTATES vs BAUMGARDNER, JESSICA | |||||||||
CVG1401960 | DRAKE, IMOGENE | 12/8/2014 | |||||||
NOTTINGHAM ESTATES vs DRAKE, IMOGENE | |||||||||
CVG1401959 | LEMOYNE, SARA | 12/8/2014 | |||||||
ZAKEN, BENJAMIN vs LEMOYNE, SARA | |||||||||
CVH1401957 | MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | 12/8/2014 | |||||||
TOLSON, STEVEN SR. vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | |||||||||
CVF1401951 | WIELAND, DAVID A. | 12/5/2014 | |||||||
CBCS vs WIELAND, DAVID A. | |||||||||
CVF1401952 | WASHINGTON, DEBORAH L | 12/5/2014 | |||||||
CBCS vs WASHINGTON, DEBORAH L | |||||||||
CVF1401953 | MOORE, TIMOTHY | 12/5/2014 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING, LLC ASSIGNEE OF HSBC BANK NEVADA vs MOORE, TIMOTHY | |||||||||
CVI1401954 | WILLIAMS, THOMAS | 12/5/2014 | |||||||
WOODS & WOODS ASSOCIATES (CONSTANCE R. WOODS) vs WILLIAMS, THOMAS | |||||||||
CVI1401955 | CARDER, JEFFREY | 12/5/2014 | |||||||
WOODS & WOODS ASSOCIATES (CONSTANCE R. WOODS) vs CARDER, JEFFREY | |||||||||
CVI1401956 | BATTEIGER, CHRISTINA | 12/5/2014 | |||||||
WOODS & WOODS ASSOCIATES (CONSTANCE R. WOODS) vs BATTEIGER, CHRISTINA | |||||||||
CVG1401949 | TRAPPS, TAMIKA | 12/4/2014 | |||||||
NORTHLAND VILLAGE APTS. vs TRAPPS, TAMIKA | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 1216, 1217, 1218 ... 1391, 1392, 1393 Next |