27855 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVG1401991 | GRADY, RODRIQUEZ | 12/16/2014 | |||||||
MEADOWS OF CATALPA vs GRADY, RODRIQUEZ | |||||||||
CVG1401990 | STUBBLEFIELD, STACY | 12/16/2014 | |||||||
MEADOWS OF CATALPA vs STUBBLEFIELD, STACY | |||||||||
CVH1401980 | MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | 12/15/2014 | |||||||
CRAWFORD, BRITNEY vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | |||||||||
CVI1401981 | MASTERCRAFT FLOORING | 12/15/2014 | |||||||
HUNT, JUDY L vs MASTERCRAFT FLOORING | |||||||||
CVE1401982 | HOWE, TERRY A. | 12/15/2014 | |||||||
PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INS CO vs HOWE, TERRY A. | |||||||||
CVF1401983 | MANNING, PATRICE | 12/15/2014 | |||||||
CACH, LLC vs MANNING, PATRICE | |||||||||
CVG1401984 | CHRISTIAN, D'ARCO | 12/15/2014 | |||||||
NORTHLAND VILLAGE APTS. vs CHRISTIAN, D'ARCO | |||||||||
CVF1401985 | STONE, SIMONE D. | 12/15/2014 | |||||||
CBCS vs STONE, SIMONE D. | |||||||||
CVF1401986 | SYKES, REBEKAH R | 12/15/2014 | |||||||
CBCS vs SYKES, REBEKAH R | |||||||||
CVH1401979 | MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | 12/12/2014 | |||||||
BOWLING, BRITTANY vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | |||||||||
CVG1401978 | LITTLE, TARA | 12/12/2014 | |||||||
VAUGHAN GROUP LTD vs LITTLE, TARA | |||||||||
CVI1401972 | SPENCER, CHRISTINA | 12/11/2014 | |||||||
SIDDENS, LYDIA M vs SPENCER, CHRISTINA | |||||||||
CVG1401973 | GRAVES, IVAN | 12/11/2014 | |||||||
SIDDENS, LYDIA M vs GRAVES, IVAN | |||||||||
CVF1401974 | FULK, TYLER | 12/11/2014 | |||||||
MARINER FINANCE, LLC vs FULK, TYLER | |||||||||
CVF1401975 | SINGLETON, BARBARA A. | 12/11/2014 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs SINGLETON, BARBARA A. | |||||||||
CVI1401976 | LEE, SHAMIKA | 12/11/2014 | |||||||
DDK FINANCIAL ASSOCIATES, LLC vs LEE, SHAMIKA | |||||||||
CVI1401977 | STRADER, JANE | 12/11/2014 | |||||||
DDK FINANCIAL ASSOCIATES, LLC vs STRADER, JANE | |||||||||
CVG1401967 | HILL, RONALD | 12/10/2014 | |||||||
GARDEN HOME PROPERTIES, LLC vs HILL, RONALD | |||||||||
CVG1401968 | DOZIER, LATISHA | 12/10/2014 | |||||||
GARDEN HOME PROPERTIES, LLC vs DOZIER, LATISHA | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 1215, 1216, 1217 ... 1391, 1392, 1393 Next |