27855 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVG1402020 | GETTER, AMBER | 12/22/2014 | |||||||
BOWERS, DANIEL vs GETTER, AMBER | |||||||||
CVG1402017 | COOK, YVETTE | 12/22/2014 | |||||||
COLLIER, EARL G vs COOK, YVETTE | |||||||||
CVG1402001 | ELLIOTT, JAMES | 12/19/2014 | |||||||
CARRIAGE HOUSE LLC DBA CARRIAGE HOUSE APARTMENTS vs ELLIOTT, JAMES | |||||||||
CVG1402002 | TERRY, JOHNATHON | 12/19/2014 | |||||||
FRIEDMAN INTEGRATED REAL ESTATE SOLUTIONS vs TERRY, JOHNATHON | |||||||||
CVI1402003 | EAGLE CREEK MARINE OWNERS JOSEPH REILING AND | 12/19/2014 | |||||||
POWERS-KILBURN, ANNETTE M vs EAGLE CREEK MARINE OWNERS JOSEPH REILING AND | |||||||||
CVF1402004 | BERRY, WENDELL | 12/19/2014 | |||||||
LIBERTY NURSING CENTER OF ENGLEWOOD, INC. vs BERRY, WENDELL | |||||||||
CVH1402005 | MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | 12/19/2014 | |||||||
DIZON, REGINALD C. vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | |||||||||
CVG1402006 | BUTCHER, TOM | 12/19/2014 | |||||||
DJ RENTALS, LLC vs BUTCHER, TOM | |||||||||
CVG1401995 | WILLIAMS, ADRIENNE | 12/18/2014 | |||||||
GARDEN WOODS APTS. vs WILLIAMS, ADRIENNE | |||||||||
CVG1402000 | WILLISON, ERIC M. | 12/18/2014 | |||||||
COUNTRY BROOKE APARTMENTS vs WILLISON, ERIC M. | |||||||||
CVE1401999 | GAY, DJUAN LEE | 12/18/2014 | |||||||
AMERICAN FAMILY INSURANCE CO vs GAY, DJUAN LEE | |||||||||
CVG1401998 | MCCLESKY, ANTHONY | 12/18/2014 | |||||||
RICHMOND, JEFFERY G vs MCCLESKY, ANTHONY | |||||||||
CVG1401997 | COLEMAN, MARK | 12/18/2014 | |||||||
CARRIAGE HOUSE LLC vs COLEMAN, MARK | |||||||||
CVG1401996 | GRIMES, SABRENIA | 12/18/2014 | |||||||
GARDEN WOODS APTS. vs GRIMES, SABRENIA | |||||||||
CVG1401994 | ALSPACH, RYAN | 12/18/2014 | |||||||
CARRIAGE HOUSE LLC vs ALSPACH, RYAN | |||||||||
CVG1401993 | MOORE, FREDERICK | 12/18/2014 | |||||||
MEADOWBROOK APARTMENTS vs MOORE, FREDERICK | |||||||||
CVH1401992 | RANKIN, MIKE | 12/17/2014 | |||||||
HAZLEY, JODI vs RANKIN, MIKE | |||||||||
CVF1401987 | EDERI, ARIK | 12/16/2014 | |||||||
MAGNUM AUTO SALES & AUTOMOTIVE REPAIR INC vs EDERI, ARIK | |||||||||
CVG1401988 | GREEN, LATONYA E. | 12/16/2014 | |||||||
WILDER, SHARON L. vs GREEN, LATONYA E. | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 1214, 1215, 1216 ... 1391, 1392, 1393 Next |