27788 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVI1500267 | PARKS MYTON, ALEXIS D. | 2/23/2015 | |||||||
CITY OF VANDALIA TAX OFFICE vs PARKS MYTON, ALEXIS D. | |||||||||
CVI1500268 | NUZZO, THERESA A. | 2/23/2015 | |||||||
CITY OF VANDALIA TAX OFFICE vs NUZZO, THERESA A. | |||||||||
CVI1500269 | YOUNG, STEPHEN | 2/23/2015 | |||||||
CITY OF VANDALIA TAX OFFICE vs YOUNG, STEPHEN | |||||||||
CVI1500270 | WATKINS, STEVY | 2/23/2015 | |||||||
CITY OF VANDALIA TAX OFFICE vs WATKINS, STEVY | |||||||||
CVI1500271 | SPOLTMAN, GARY L. | 2/23/2015 | |||||||
CITY OF VANDALIA TAX OFFICE vs SPOLTMAN, GARY L. | |||||||||
CVG1500274 | WILSON, JOHN | 2/23/2015 | |||||||
FREEDOM FOR LIVING PROP MGMT vs WILSON, JOHN | |||||||||
CVI1500266 | HARLOW, SUZANNE R. | 2/23/2015 | |||||||
CITY OF VANDALIA TAX OFFICE vs HARLOW, SUZANNE R. | |||||||||
CVF1500246 | HENRY, WILLIAM | 2/20/2015 | |||||||
SYNCHRONY BANK vs HENRY, WILLIAM | |||||||||
CVH1500247 | DON PETIT | 2/20/2015 | |||||||
CLEMONS, KETORI vs DON PETIT | |||||||||
CVF1500241 | WHITE, CAITLIN A. | 2/19/2015 | |||||||
CBCS vs WHITE, CAITLIN A. | |||||||||
CVF1500245 | DIRECTSTAT USA, LLC | 2/19/2015 | |||||||
CITY OF CLAYTON, OHIO vs DIRECTSTAT USA, LLC | |||||||||
CVF1500244 | LOVE, RICKEY | 2/19/2015 | |||||||
CITY OF CLAYTON, OHIO vs LOVE, RICKEY | |||||||||
CVF1500243 | PAPALIOS, STEPHAN C. | 2/19/2015 | |||||||
BUCKEYE STATE MUTUAL INS. CO. vs PAPALIOS, STEPHAN C. | |||||||||
CVF1500242 | BAKER, GARY A. | 2/19/2015 | |||||||
STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE CO. vs BAKER, GARY A. | |||||||||
CVF1500240 | THOMAS, RANDALL | 2/19/2015 | |||||||
CBCS vs THOMAS, RANDALL | |||||||||
CVG1500237 | HOOD, ROBERT | 2/18/2015 | |||||||
ALBERT, JEFFREY P. vs HOOD, ROBERT | |||||||||
CVG1500238 | RIVERS, JESSICA | 2/18/2015 | |||||||
GOUDY, JAMES vs RIVERS, JESSICA | |||||||||
CVH1500239 | PETIT, DON | 2/18/2015 | |||||||
GOULETTE, CHARLES vs PETIT, DON | |||||||||
CVI1500226 | ALEXANDER, ROBERT L. II | 2/17/2015 | |||||||
ZOELLNER, CATHY D. vs ALEXANDER, ROBERT L. II | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 1190, 1191, 1192 ... 1388, 1389, 1390 Next |