27855 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVF1500584 | LITTON, THOMAS | 4/30/2015 | |||||||
CITY OF ENGLEWOOD, OHIO vs LITTON, THOMAS | |||||||||
CVF1500585 | JOHNSON, BRADLEY | 4/30/2015 | |||||||
CITY OF ENGLEWOOD, OHIO vs JOHNSON, BRADLEY | |||||||||
CVG1500586 | GEORGE, STEPHANIE | 4/30/2015 | |||||||
STOVER, BRIAN S. vs GEORGE, STEPHANIE | |||||||||
CVF1500583 | MOORE, MARK K. | 4/30/2015 | |||||||
CITY OF ENGLEWOOD, OHIO vs MOORE, MARK K. | |||||||||
CVG1500577 | MCKINNEY, PHILLIP | 4/29/2015 | |||||||
TIMBERLAKE LP vs MCKINNEY, PHILLIP | |||||||||
CVG1500573 | NEWMAN, MONA'LISA | 4/28/2015 | |||||||
TILAK NAGAR, LLC vs NEWMAN, MONA'LISA | |||||||||
CVF1500574 | ELLIS, MARLA R. | 4/28/2015 | |||||||
DAYTON GASTRONENTEROLOGY INC. vs ELLIS, MARLA R. | |||||||||
CVF1500575 | ALSOBROOKS, DENNIS M. | 4/28/2015 | |||||||
GREATER DAYTON SURGERY CENTER vs ALSOBROOKS, DENNIS M. | |||||||||
CVG1500576 | THIOMBANE, REBECCA GOLDSMITH | 4/28/2015 | |||||||
BOWER, DEBRA vs THIOMBANE, REBECCA GOLDSMITH | |||||||||
CVG1500566 | LATESSA, ANTHONY | 4/27/2015 | |||||||
AH4R-OH, LLC vs LATESSA, ANTHONY | |||||||||
CVF1500572 | VANEVERY, DAVID | 4/27/2015 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs VANEVERY, DAVID | |||||||||
CVF1500571 | VANATTA, KRISTEN | 4/27/2015 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DOING BUSINESS IN OHIO AS vs VANATTA, KRISTEN | |||||||||
CVG1500570 | HANLEY, ELKANAH | 4/27/2015 | |||||||
ROOST REAL ESTATE COMPANY vs HANLEY, ELKANAH | |||||||||
CVF1500569 | HALL, JOHN R. | 4/27/2015 | |||||||
CACH, LLC vs HALL, JOHN R. | |||||||||
CVG1500568 | LETT, RICHARD | 4/27/2015 | |||||||
BROOKFIELD NORTH APTS vs LETT, RICHARD | |||||||||
CVF1500567 | FUGATE, MELANIE | 4/27/2015 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC. LLC vs FUGATE, MELANIE | |||||||||
CVH1500565 | CITY OF CLAYTON | 4/27/2015 | |||||||
MOHLER, JOHN vs CITY OF CLAYTON | |||||||||
CVI1500563 | PAULUS, SHARON | 4/24/2015 | |||||||
SUTHERLAND, ANDREA vs PAULUS, SHARON | |||||||||
CVG1500564 | WARD, JASON | 4/24/2015 | |||||||
MIAMI VALLEY HOUSING OPPORT. vs WARD, JASON | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 1177, 1178, 1179 ... 1391, 1392, 1393 Next |