27855 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVG1500616 | WEAVER, HOLLY | 5/11/2015 | |||||||
J. ALLEN WILMES ATTORNEY AT LAW vs WEAVER, HOLLY | |||||||||
CVG1500617 | COLE, SHANA | 5/11/2015 | |||||||
WELLER MORTGAGES, INC. vs COLE, SHANA | |||||||||
CVG1500618 | JONES, TAMEKA | 5/11/2015 | |||||||
EQUICORP REALTY, INC. vs JONES, TAMEKA | |||||||||
CVG1500619 | ROSS, AMBER | 5/11/2015 | |||||||
DAYTON INVESTMENT GROUP vs ROSS, AMBER | |||||||||
CVG1500620 | GARCIA, BRIDGET | 5/11/2015 | |||||||
WEBER, BETTY vs GARCIA, BRIDGET | |||||||||
CVG1500621 | MITCHELL, TIFFANY | 5/11/2015 | |||||||
COY, CRAIG vs MITCHELL, TIFFANY | |||||||||
CVG1500622 | SMITH, JESSICA | 5/11/2015 | |||||||
VILLAS OF ENGLEWOOD, LLC vs SMITH, JESSICA | |||||||||
CVG1500615 | WINTROW, BRANDON | 5/11/2015 | |||||||
WINTROW, SANDY vs WINTROW, BRANDON | |||||||||
CVH1500610 | DON PETIT REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | 5/8/2015 | |||||||
FLOYD, FALLON vs DON PETIT REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | |||||||||
CVF1500607 | MOORE, TERRELL J. | 5/7/2015 | |||||||
STATE OF OHIO vs MOORE, TERRELL J. | |||||||||
CVF1500608 | SMITH, NANCY | 5/7/2015 | |||||||
LIBERTY NURSING CENTER OF ENGLEWOOD, INC. vs SMITH, NANCY | |||||||||
CVG1500609 | BENSON, DAMIAN | 5/7/2015 | |||||||
AMERICAN RIVARD, LTD vs BENSON, DAMIAN | |||||||||
CVF1500604 | ALLEN, KASEY | 5/6/2015 | |||||||
CREDIT VENTURES, LLC C/O RACHEL J. MASON vs ALLEN, KASEY | |||||||||
CVG1500605 | WILLIAMSON, TYLER | 5/6/2015 | |||||||
GARDEN WOODS APTS. vs WILLIAMSON, TYLER | |||||||||
CVG1500606 | COULHOUN, SASHA | 5/6/2015 | |||||||
ST. RITA LLC vs COULHOUN, SASHA | |||||||||
CVF1500602 | RENTZ, CYNTHIA M. | 5/5/2015 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs RENTZ, CYNTHIA M. | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 1175, 1176, 1177 ... 1391, 1392, 1393 Next |