27788 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVF1500601 | KISER, SCOTT E. | 5/4/2015 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC LLC vs KISER, SCOTT E. | |||||||||
CVG1500587 | MOORE, DEBRA | 5/1/2015 | |||||||
SIENNA SPRINGS I vs MOORE, DEBRA | |||||||||
CVI1500588 | DAPORE, KEVIN | 5/1/2015 | |||||||
DDK FINANCIAL ASSOCIATES LLC vs DAPORE, KEVIN | |||||||||
CVF1500589 | BURCHETT, NATALIE | 5/1/2015 | |||||||
CITY OF CLAYTON, OHIO vs BURCHETT, NATALIE | |||||||||
CVF1500590 | FOGLER, JOSEPH | 5/1/2015 | |||||||
CITY OF CLAYTON, OHIO vs FOGLER, JOSEPH | |||||||||
CVF1500591 | SIGLER, KENNETH | 5/1/2015 | |||||||
CITY OF CLAYTON, OHIO vs SIGLER, KENNETH | |||||||||
CVH1500592 | PETIT, DON | 5/1/2015 | |||||||
NOOKS, COREY vs PETIT, DON | |||||||||
CVH1500593 | DON PETIT | 5/1/2015 | |||||||
WILLIS, JORDYN vs DON PETIT | |||||||||
CVF1500580 | TRITES, DEVAN R. | 4/30/2015 | |||||||
SHORELINE FUNDING II, LLC ASSIGNEE OF US BANK NA ND vs TRITES, DEVAN R. | |||||||||
CVG1500586 | GEORGE, STEPHANIE | 4/30/2015 | |||||||
STOVER, BRIAN S. vs GEORGE, STEPHANIE | |||||||||
CVF1500585 | JOHNSON, BRADLEY | 4/30/2015 | |||||||
CITY OF ENGLEWOOD, OHIO vs JOHNSON, BRADLEY | |||||||||
CVF1500584 | LITTON, THOMAS | 4/30/2015 | |||||||
CITY OF ENGLEWOOD, OHIO vs LITTON, THOMAS | |||||||||
CVF1500583 | MOORE, MARK K. | 4/30/2015 | |||||||
CITY OF ENGLEWOOD, OHIO vs MOORE, MARK K. | |||||||||
CVF1500582 | SCARBERRY, SHAWN | 4/30/2015 | |||||||
CITY OF ENGLEWOOD, OHIO vs SCARBERRY, SHAWN | |||||||||
CVF1500581 | WALKER, AYISHA | 4/30/2015 | |||||||
CITY OF ENGLEWOOD, OHIO vs WALKER, AYISHA | |||||||||
CVG1500579 | CURRY, LAQUAYSHA | 4/30/2015 | |||||||
DAYTON NORTHLAND VILLAGE LTD. vs CURRY, LAQUAYSHA | |||||||||
CVG1500578 | BERRY, COLADA | 4/30/2015 | |||||||
DAYTON NORTHLAND VILLAGE LTD vs BERRY, COLADA | |||||||||
CVG1500577 | MCKINNEY, PHILLIP | 4/29/2015 | |||||||
TIMBERLAKE LP vs MCKINNEY, PHILLIP | |||||||||
CVG1500573 | NEWMAN, MONA'LISA | 4/28/2015 | |||||||
TILAK NAGAR, LLC vs NEWMAN, MONA'LISA | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 1173, 1174, 1175 ... 1388, 1389, 1390 Next |