27788 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVG1500622 | SMITH, JESSICA | 5/11/2015 | |||||||
VILLAS OF ENGLEWOOD, LLC vs SMITH, JESSICA | |||||||||
CVH1500610 | DON PETIT REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | 5/8/2015 | |||||||
FLOYD, FALLON vs DON PETIT REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | |||||||||
CVF1500607 | MOORE, TERRELL J. | 5/7/2015 | |||||||
STATE OF OHIO vs MOORE, TERRELL J. | |||||||||
CVF1500608 | SMITH, NANCY | 5/7/2015 | |||||||
LIBERTY NURSING CENTER OF ENGLEWOOD, INC. vs SMITH, NANCY | |||||||||
CVG1500609 | BENSON, DAMIAN | 5/7/2015 | |||||||
AMERICAN RIVARD, LTD vs BENSON, DAMIAN | |||||||||
CVF1500604 | ALLEN, KASEY | 5/6/2015 | |||||||
CREDIT VENTURES, LLC C/O RACHEL J. MASON vs ALLEN, KASEY | |||||||||
CVG1500605 | WILLIAMSON, TYLER | 5/6/2015 | |||||||
GARDEN WOODS APTS. vs WILLIAMSON, TYLER | |||||||||
CVG1500606 | COULHOUN, SASHA | 5/6/2015 | |||||||
ST. RITA LLC vs COULHOUN, SASHA | |||||||||
CVF1500602 | RENTZ, CYNTHIA M. | 5/5/2015 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs RENTZ, CYNTHIA M. | |||||||||
CVG1500603 | FRANZ, JOHN | 5/5/2015 | |||||||
SIDDENS, LYDIA M. vs FRANZ, JOHN | |||||||||
CVF1500594 | TILLEY, RONNA | 5/4/2015 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DOING BUSINESS IN OHIO AS vs TILLEY, RONNA | |||||||||
CVG1500595 | SMITH, CHADWICK A. | 5/4/2015 | |||||||
ELK HORN RENTALS LLC vs SMITH, CHADWICK A. | |||||||||
CVF1500596 | LEWIS, MICHELE | 5/4/2015 | |||||||
UNIVERSAL 1 CREDIT UNION vs LEWIS, MICHELE | |||||||||
CVG1500597 | ALLEN, MAQUETTA | 5/4/2015 | |||||||
DENIZEN MANAGEMENT MIKU FOUNTAINHEAD, LLC vs ALLEN, MAQUETTA | |||||||||
CVH1500598 | PETIT, DON | 5/4/2015 | |||||||
KENNY, MICHAEL E JR vs PETIT, DON | |||||||||
CVF1500599 | CHRISSIS, JAMES | 5/4/2015 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DOING BUSINESS IN OHIO AS vs CHRISSIS, JAMES | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 1172, 1173, 1174 ... 1388, 1389, 1390 Next |