27855 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVF1500678 | ENTERPRISE RAC COMPANY OF CINCINNATI, LLC | 5/26/2015 | |||||||
THE DAYTON POWER AND LIGHT CO vs ENTERPRISE RAC COMPANY OF CINCINNATI, LLC | |||||||||
CVG1500679 | IVY, KANDI | 5/26/2015 | |||||||
CURTIS, PAM vs IVY, KANDI | |||||||||
CVG1500680 | KING, JEFFREY | 5/26/2015 | |||||||
NANCY PINARD, LLC vs KING, JEFFREY | |||||||||
CVH1500681 | REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | 5/26/2015 | |||||||
BROWN, TAMIKA vs REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | |||||||||
CVF1500677 | MILLER, CYNTHIA | 5/26/2015 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO INC vs MILLER, CYNTHIA | |||||||||
CVF1500669 | LATESSA, TONY V. | 5/22/2015 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE, N.A. vs LATESSA, TONY V. | |||||||||
CVH1500671 | PETIT, DON | 5/22/2015 | |||||||
REILLY, SUSAN LYNNE vs PETIT, DON | |||||||||
CVG1500670 | THOMASON, BONITA | 5/22/2015 | |||||||
NANCY PINARD, LTD. vs THOMASON, BONITA | |||||||||
CVG1500668 | COFFEY, AMBER | 5/22/2015 | |||||||
CARRIAGE HOUSE LLC vs COFFEY, AMBER | |||||||||
CVG1500667 | HARDWICK, ZURI | 5/22/2015 | |||||||
CARRIAGE HOUSE LLC vs HARDWICK, ZURI | |||||||||
CVG1500666 | MILLERTON, DORRIAN | 5/22/2015 | |||||||
CARRIAGE HOUSE LLC vs MILLERTON, DORRIAN | |||||||||
CVG1500665 | PAPALIOS, STEPHAN | 5/22/2015 | |||||||
CARRIAGE HOUSE LLC vs PAPALIOS, STEPHAN | |||||||||
CVG1500664 | SHACKLEFORD, TABITHA | 5/22/2015 | |||||||
WILCOX, ARTHUR E. JR. vs SHACKLEFORD, TABITHA | |||||||||
CVG1500663 | SHRIVER, STEVEN | 5/21/2015 | |||||||
COUNTRY BROOKE APARTMENTS vs SHRIVER, STEVEN | |||||||||
CVF1500662 | LAWSON, BRITTANY | 5/20/2015 | |||||||
JAMES R KIRKLAND CO LPA vs LAWSON, BRITTANY | |||||||||
CVG1500660 | WILLOUGHBY, CHUCK | 5/19/2015 | |||||||
DBH ENTERPRISES, INC. vs WILLOUGHBY, CHUCK | |||||||||
CVG1500661 | COLEMAN, DERRICK | 5/19/2015 | |||||||
OBERER MANAGEMENT SERVICES vs COLEMAN, DERRICK | |||||||||
CVG1500651 | TOMLIN, SHEILA | 5/18/2015 | |||||||
CLINARD, STANLEY B vs TOMLIN, SHEILA | |||||||||
CVH1500652 | DON PETIT, REGISTRAR BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES | 5/18/2015 | |||||||
MCMANUS, WILLIAM vs DON PETIT, REGISTRAR BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 1168, 1169, 1170 ... 1391, 1392, 1393 Next |