27908 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVG1500816 | THOMSON, BONITA | 6/25/2015 | |||||||
NANCY PINARD, LTD vs THOMSON, BONITA | |||||||||
CVG1500812 | GRIMES, DAVID A. | 6/24/2015 | |||||||
ESSEX, MATTHEW W. vs GRIMES, DAVID A. | |||||||||
CVG1500813 | HOWARD, SUSAN | 6/24/2015 | |||||||
UHRIG, DOUG vs HOWARD, SUSAN | |||||||||
CVI1500811 | BEXLEY, ANTHONY | 6/23/2015 | |||||||
DDK FINANCIAL ASSOCIATES LLC vs BEXLEY, ANTHONY | |||||||||
CVI1500810 | KIMBLE, LUCILLE | 6/23/2015 | |||||||
DDK FINANCIAL ASSOCIATES LLC vs KIMBLE, LUCILLE | |||||||||
CVI1500809 | BLAKLEY, RICHY | 6/23/2015 | |||||||
DDK FINANCIAL ASSOCIATES LLC vs BLAKLEY, RICHY | |||||||||
CVG1500808 | PATTERSON, TIM | 6/23/2015 | |||||||
EWART, MARK B vs PATTERSON, TIM | |||||||||
CVG1500807 | KNIGHT, MELONEY | 6/23/2015 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES DBA vs KNIGHT, MELONEY | |||||||||
CVG1500806 | BLANTON, GREGORY | 6/23/2015 | |||||||
CAR-TWO, INC vs BLANTON, GREGORY | |||||||||
CVG1500805 | PARKS, TAMMY | 6/23/2015 | |||||||
VILLAS OF ENGLEWOOD, LLC vs PARKS, TAMMY | |||||||||
CVH1500804 | PETIT, DON | 6/23/2015 | |||||||
LANE, J B vs PETIT, DON | |||||||||
CVF1500800 | ASHE, CHANELL L | 6/22/2015 | |||||||
CAPITAL AUTO CREDIT, LLC vs ASHE, CHANELL L | |||||||||
CVG1500801 | EDWARDS, PAUL | 6/22/2015 | |||||||
COLONIAL FUND 17, LP C/O CLEARSPRINGLOAN SERVICES vs EDWARDS, PAUL | |||||||||
CVG1500802 | LANDRUM, RAVYN | 6/22/2015 | |||||||
LEGGS, THURMAN JR vs LANDRUM, RAVYN | |||||||||
CVI1500803 | BANKS, DAVID | 6/22/2015 | |||||||
LEBRON, ARTURE JR vs BANKS, DAVID | |||||||||
CVH1500790 | REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | 6/19/2015 | |||||||
LEWIS, JOSHUA vs REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | |||||||||
CVG1500791 | REESE, CHARLES D. | 6/19/2015 | |||||||
COMTECH REALTY, LLC AGENT FOR MARK A. MONROE AND vs REESE, CHARLES D. | |||||||||
CVG1500792 | MURRAY, MICHAEL | 6/19/2015 | |||||||
JORDAN, ELEANORE vs MURRAY, MICHAEL | |||||||||
CVG1500793 | JONES, WILLSHAY | 6/19/2015 | |||||||
DAYTON NORTHLAND VILLAGE LTD vs JONES, WILLSHAY | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 1149, 1150, 1151 ... 1394, 1395, 1396 Next |