27855 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVI1501206 | RUTLEDGE, SAUDIQ | 9/23/2015 | |||||||
DDK FINANCIAL ASSOC, LLC vs RUTLEDGE, SAUDIQ | |||||||||
CVF1501207 | PATILLO, KIMBERLY | 9/23/2015 | |||||||
MARINER FINANCE, LLC vs PATILLO, KIMBERLY | |||||||||
CVI1501205 | GRAY, CHARLES | 9/23/2015 | |||||||
DDK FINANCIAL ASSOC, LLC vs GRAY, CHARLES | |||||||||
CVI1501186 | LAY-NELUMS, MARY | 9/22/2015 | |||||||
HILL, JANICE vs LAY-NELUMS, MARY | |||||||||
CVG1501184 | VAUGHN, TAMESHA | 9/21/2015 | |||||||
LUCAS, JESSE vs VAUGHN, TAMESHA | |||||||||
CVF1501185 | FOX, JOHN | 9/21/2015 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs FOX, JOHN | |||||||||
CVG1501177 | STACY, RYAN | 9/18/2015 | |||||||
CARRIAGE HOUSE LLC vs STACY, RYAN | |||||||||
CVG1501183 | TIBBS, JEFFREY | 9/18/2015 | |||||||
MEADOWBROOK APARTMENTS vs TIBBS, JEFFREY | |||||||||
CVG1501182 | PERRY, DARREON | 9/18/2015 | |||||||
ROOKWOOD PROPERTIES vs PERRY, DARREON | |||||||||
CVG1501181 | ANSPACH, DERECK | 9/18/2015 | |||||||
CARRIAGE HOUSE LLC vs ANSPACH, DERECK | |||||||||
CVG1501180 | BODDIE, EMMA | 9/18/2015 | |||||||
CARRIAGE HOUSE LLC vs BODDIE, EMMA | |||||||||
CVG1501179 | KING, VICTORIA | 9/18/2015 | |||||||
CARRIAGE HOUSE LLC vs KING, VICTORIA | |||||||||
CVG1501178 | WILLIAMSON, TONYA | 9/18/2015 | |||||||
CARRIAGE HOUSE LLC vs WILLIAMSON, TONYA | |||||||||
CVF1501176 | RIVERS, JIMMIE | 9/18/2015 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING, LLC FORMER OBLIGEE OF CREDIT ONE vs RIVERS, JIMMIE | |||||||||
CVF1501175 | BUSH, DAVID | 9/18/2015 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC FORMER OBLIGEE OF CREDIT ONE vs BUSH, DAVID | |||||||||
CVF1501174 | INGALLS, BRIAN P. | 9/18/2015 | |||||||
VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC ASSIGNEE OF HSBC CONSUMER vs INGALLS, BRIAN P. | |||||||||
CVF1501173 | RANK, JERRY | 9/18/2015 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORP. vs RANK, JERRY | |||||||||
CVF1501167 | GIST, JUSTIN M. | 9/17/2015 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs GIST, JUSTIN M. | |||||||||
CVH1501168 | REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | 9/17/2015 | |||||||
JANCAUSKAS, MICHAEL vs REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 1125, 1126, 1127 ... 1391, 1392, 1393 Next |