27855 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVF1501246 | WILLIAMS, JOHN | 10/5/2015 | |||||||
CAPITAL ALLIANCE FINANCIAL LLC FORMER OBLIGEE OF HSBC BANK vs WILLIAMS, JOHN | |||||||||
CVG1501247 | ALABBAS, HAMMAD | 10/5/2015 | |||||||
DAYTONA PARKWAY DEVELOP. LLC vs ALABBAS, HAMMAD | |||||||||
CVF1501248 | SPITZER, DAVE | 10/5/2015 | |||||||
SIBCO BUILDING PRODUCTS vs SPITZER, DAVE | |||||||||
CVF1501249 | JONES, CAMMIE | 10/5/2015 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs JONES, CAMMIE | |||||||||
CVF1501250 | BROWN, DEBORAH | 10/5/2015 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs BROWN, DEBORAH | |||||||||
CVF1501252 | DUBOSE, TRACY A | 10/5/2015 | |||||||
BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE vs DUBOSE, TRACY A | |||||||||
CVF1501253 | HUTCHISON, CAMIL | 10/5/2015 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs HUTCHISON, CAMIL | |||||||||
CVF1501254 | FLORY, DONNA | 10/5/2015 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs FLORY, DONNA | |||||||||
CVG1501244 | ROBINSON, BRENDA | 10/5/2015 | |||||||
FOREST CITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, INC vs ROBINSON, BRENDA | |||||||||
CVI1501240 | HARRISON, CHARLEY E | 10/2/2015 | |||||||
EQUIPMENT SPECIALISTS DAYTON, LLC vs HARRISON, CHARLEY E | |||||||||
CVF1501239 | HILDEBRAND, JAMES H | 10/2/2015 | |||||||
MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP vs HILDEBRAND, JAMES H | |||||||||
CVF1501235 | DIPPOLITO, CHERRIE | 10/1/2015 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DOING BUSINESS IN OHIO AS MIDLAND vs DIPPOLITO, CHERRIE | |||||||||
CVF1501236 | HOLMES, BETTY M | 10/1/2015 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC C/O FENTON & MCGARVEY LAW FIRM vs HOLMES, BETTY M | |||||||||
CVH1501237 | PETIT, DON | 10/1/2015 | |||||||
JOHNSON, PIERRE vs PETIT, DON | |||||||||
CVI1501238 | STONESPRING/CARESPRING, LLC | 10/1/2015 | |||||||
HOLFINGER, RICHARD vs STONESPRING/CARESPRING, LLC | |||||||||
CVF1501233 | FONTEM, FRANCIS | 9/30/2015 | |||||||
RADIOLOGY PHYSICIANS INC C/O SLOVIN AND ASSOC CO LPA vs FONTEM, FRANCIS | |||||||||
CVH1501234 | PETIT, DON | 9/30/2015 | |||||||
EATON, WILLIAM CHASE vs PETIT, DON | |||||||||
CVI1501228 | LAKEFRONT LINES, INC. | 9/29/2015 | |||||||
HILL, DONALD G. vs LAKEFRONT LINES, INC. | |||||||||
CVG1501229 | WILLOUGHBY, LISA | 9/29/2015 | |||||||
HENGER, LORI vs WILLOUGHBY, LISA | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 1122, 1123, 1124 ... 1391, 1392, 1393 Next |