19809 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2023EST02143 | THE ESTATE OF JAMES BARBA | 10/23/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02153 | THE ESTATE OF THOMAS ZILLES | 10/20/2023 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02156 | THE ESTATE OF HOWARD TEAGUE | 10/19/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02138 | THE ESTATE OF JOAN TERWILLIGER | 10/19/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01688 | THE ESTATE OF THEODORE GATES JR | 10/19/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; WITH WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01880 | THE ESTATE OF STEVEN BARKER | 10/17/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02105 | THE ESTATE OF MICHELLE COLE | 10/17/2023 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01946 | THE ESTATE OF GENEVA ORR | 10/17/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02066 | THE ESTATE OF ETHEL WATTS | 10/16/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01812 | THE ESTATE OF DON COOPER | 10/16/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02140 | THE ESTATE OF DENISE HOLLAND | 10/13/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL SUCCESSOR ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01664 | THE ESTATE OF NANCY STEGEMAN | 10/11/2023 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02065 | THE ESTATE OF MURIEL REINE | 10/11/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02049 | THE ESTATE OF MARTHA HIBBS | 10/11/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01002 | THE ESTATE OF ELOISE THOMASSON | 10/10/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; WITH WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01894 | THE ESTATE OF CONNIE MARTIN | 10/10/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01980 | THE ESTATE OF FRANCES COPELAND | 10/6/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01997 | THE ESTATE OF FREDERICK CRAWFORD | 10/4/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02047 | THE ESTATE OF BRADFORD STALLWORTH | 10/4/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 49, 50, 51 ... 989, 990, 991 Next |