19809 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2023EST02265 | THE ESTATE OF AARON DAVIS | 11/3/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02247 | THE ESTATE OF ROBERT LOWE JR. | 11/2/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02238 | THE ESTATE OF MAE FRAME | 11/2/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01624 | THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL ZARKA | 11/2/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01497 | THE ESTATE OF WILLIAM TUCKER | 11/2/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01882 | THE ESTATE OF MARTIN CRUMP | 11/1/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02226 | THE ESTATE OF JACK KLAPP | 10/31/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02236 | THE ESTATE OF JEFFREY CAVEY | 10/31/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02230 | THE ESTATE OF ANDRA WEST | 10/31/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02218 | THE ESTATE OF MARY WOODS | 10/27/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02182 | THE ESTATE OF EUGENE FLETCHER | 10/25/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02142 | THE ESTATE OF LARRY PECK SR. | 10/25/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01995 | THE ESTATE OF JULIA HAMMER | 10/25/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02174 | THE ESTATE OF HENRY HARRIS | 10/24/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02129 | THE ESTATE OF WATHLEEN ADAMS | 10/24/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02113 | THE ESTATE OF CHARLENE FLOYD | 10/24/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02160 | THE ESTATE OF CAROLYN CUZZORT | 10/24/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 48, 49, 50 ... 989, 990, 991 Next |