19809 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2023EST01991 | THE ESTATE OF CHARLENE MILES | 11/21/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02262 | THE ESTATE OF CATHY LEWIS | 11/20/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02229 | THE ESTATE OF INEZ JAUDON | 11/20/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
1997EST316443 | THE ESTATE OF SEVERT, RICHARD C. | 11/20/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02361 | THE ESTATE OF ANN STEMPLE | 11/20/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02242 | THE ESTATE OF CLODETTE BONHOMME | 11/17/2023 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02320 | THE ESTATE OF BETH SMITH | 11/17/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02239 | THE ESTATE OF JAMES MILLER | 11/17/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02199 | THE ESTATE OF CAROL MAUERSBERG | 11/14/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02332 | THE ESTATE OF FRED MOORE | 11/14/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01213 | THE ESTATE OF MARSHA BOYD | 11/14/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01659 | THE ESTATE OF PAMELA EDWARDS | 11/14/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02219 | THE ESTATE OF JESSICA HITES | 11/14/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02223 | THE ESTATE OF ROBERT TURNER | 11/13/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02211 | THE ESTATE OF ROBERT PUTERBAUGH | 11/13/2023 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02167 | THE ESTATE OF JOE DYER | 11/13/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02249 | THE ESTATE OF CYNTHIA KESELRING | 11/7/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02221 | THE ESTATE OF ROBERT WATERMAN | 11/7/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02261 | THE ESTATE OF CAMERON GLOVER | 11/3/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 47, 48, 49 ... 989, 990, 991 Next |