19809 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2023EST02352 | THE ESTATE OF ROBERT SNYDER | 12/1/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01616 | THE ESTATE OF TRAVIS WILLIAMS | 12/1/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2022EST02203 | THE ESTATE OF DANIEL BROWN | 12/1/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02338 | THE ESTATE OF BRENDA PHILLIPS | 12/1/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02410 | THE ESTATE OF FRANCES BLAIR | 12/1/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02344 | THE ESTATE OF TERRY WEBB | 11/30/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02393 | THE ESTATE OF EDWARD MANTEUFEL | 11/29/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01071 | THE ESTATE OF DAVID MACY | 11/29/2023 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02388 | THE ESTATE OF SUSAN EKLUND-LEEN | 11/28/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02111 | THE ESTATE OF LINDA COURTNEY | 11/28/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02326 | THE ESTATE OF JOHN SWENSKIE JR | 11/27/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02017 | THE ESTATE OF WADE BRUNSON | 11/27/2023 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02374 | THE ESTATE OF HARRY MILBY | 11/27/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02314 | THE ESTATE OF WILLIE KINNEL | 11/27/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02370 | THE ESTATE OF LARRY LUTZ | 11/27/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02005 | THE ESTATE OF BETH SIOUFFI | 11/27/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02360 | THE ESTATE OF CAROL DURHAM | 11/27/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02286 | THE ESTATE OF HALIT MURADOV | 11/27/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 46, 47, 48 ... 989, 990, 991 Next |