19809 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2023EST02369 | THE ESTATE OF BETTY WOODS | 12/15/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02513 | THE ESTATE OF SYLVAN ELLER | 12/15/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02354 | THE ESTATE OF LOUIS SCHULKER | 12/15/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02484 | THE ESTATE OF VERONICA COLLINS | 12/14/2023 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02358 | THE ESTATE OF JOHN WALSH | 12/14/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02402 | THE ESTATE OF SHERRY VAUGHN | 12/14/2023 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02443 | THE ESTATE OF CHARLES HENRY | 12/14/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02512 | THE ESTATE OF RANDY JOHNSON | 12/14/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02480 | THE ESTATE OF ALBERT STAUB | 12/14/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2022EST01729 | THE ESTATE OF JOSEPH SCHMITT | 12/13/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02507 | THE ESTATE OF MARK WELLS | 12/13/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02405 | THE ESTATE OF DARRYL CAMP | 12/12/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02400 | THE ESTATE OF WENDY KIER | 12/12/2023 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02514 | THE ESTATE OF FLOYD HINES | 12/12/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02244 | THE ESTATE OF DANIEL STRAYER | 12/12/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02407 | THE ESTATE OF CHARLES WHITE SR. | 12/12/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02396 | THE ESTATE OF SAFAR TAKHSILOV | 12/11/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01971 | THE ESTATE OF SALLY CAMPLIN | 12/8/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02477 | THE ESTATE OF BEATRICE STEIN | 12/8/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 44, 45, 46 ... 989, 990, 991 Next |