19809 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2023EST02322 | THE ESTATE OF BARBARA JONES | 12/21/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02559 | THE ESTATE OF SANDRA BRACK | 12/20/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02509 | THE ESTATE OF JANICE HOLMES | 12/20/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02546 | THE ESTATE OF ANTOINETTE COOPER | 12/20/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2019EST01502 | THE ESTATE OF CAROL ALFORD | 12/19/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02517 | THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL MASON | 12/19/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02532 | THE ESTATE OF GERALD MCCOY | 12/19/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST00690 | THE ESTATE OF CAROL HUNSBARGER | 12/19/2023 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02471 | THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL ROSE | 12/18/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02280 | THE ESTATE OF LUCY WILLIAMS | 12/18/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02508 | THE ESTATE OF DEBORAH MILLER | 12/18/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02540 | THE ESTATE OF STANLEY OLSZEWSKI | 12/18/2023 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02549 | THE ESTATE OF ELGRACE WILBORN SR | 12/18/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02522 | THE ESTATE OF MARION RICE | 12/18/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02534 | THE ESTATE OF TERRY ALDORA | 12/15/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02474 | THE ESTATE OF RICHARD MARSHALL | 12/15/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02354 | THE ESTATE OF LOUIS SCHULKER | 12/15/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02489 | THE ESTATE OF OLIVE ASHBAUGH HOPKINS | 12/15/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01831 | THE ESTATE OF ESTHER HANEY | 12/15/2023 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 43, 44, 45 ... 989, 990, 991 Next |