19809 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2023EST02503 | THE ESTATE OF JACKIE REED | 12/28/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02556 | THE ESTATE OF GAYE QUINN | 12/28/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02580 | THE ESTATE OF JEAN PALMER | 12/27/2023 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02587 | THE ESTATE OF RITA DAKIN | 12/27/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02584 | THE ESTATE OF DORIS PRETHER | 12/26/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02577 | THE ESTATE OF PAMELA WEAVER | 12/26/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02529 | THE ESTATE OF KATHERINE TESNO | 12/22/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02557 | THE ESTATE OF JUDITH VENTRELLA | 12/22/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01885 | THE ESTATE OF DELORES PARLIAMENT | 12/22/2023 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02078 | THE ESTATE OF DOROTHY MARTZ | 12/22/2023 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02456 | THE ESTATE OF KENNETH IRWIN | 12/22/2023 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02552 | THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL FARMER | 12/21/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02564 | THE ESTATE OF JAMES MACK | 12/21/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02525 | THE ESTATE OF LORI ROBINSON | 12/21/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2014EST02085 | THE ESTATE OF JESSE HARRIS, JR. | 12/21/2023 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 42, 43, 44 ... 989, 990, 991 Next |