19809 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2024EST00081 | THE ESTATE OF THOMAS SILBERMAN | 1/19/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00094 | THE ESTATE OF CONNIE ARCHER | 1/18/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00111 | THE ESTATE OF BEN BENNETT SR | 1/18/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00067 | THE ESTATE OF WILLIAM WARD | 1/17/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00070 | THE ESTATE OF RUBY TAYLOR | 1/17/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00052 | THE ESTATE OF KEITH SNELL | 1/17/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00061 | THE ESTATE OF NANCY HOUSTON | 1/16/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00085 | THE ESTATE OF GREGORY MERKER | 1/12/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00076 | THE ESTATE OF BRIAN GERTH | 1/12/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00047 | THE ESTATE OF LLOYD RIDENOUR | 1/12/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00086 | THE ESTATE OF GERALD STAPLES | 1/12/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02589 | THE ESTATE OF PAMELA WARD | 1/11/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00074 | THE ESTATE OF WALTER MCCRACKEN JR | 1/11/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00066 | THE ESTATE OF PAUL GALLOWAY | 1/11/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; WITH WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00051 | THE ESTATE OF DONALD JORDAN | 1/9/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00007 | THE ESTATE OF JOAN ASHBURN | 1/9/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02241 | THE ESTATE OF TONY HILL | 1/9/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00029 | THE ESTATE OF JULIA ROBINSON | 1/8/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 40, 41, 42 ... 989, 990, 991 Next |