19809 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2024EST00151 | THE ESTATE OF DONNIE MURRAY | 2/1/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00137 | THE ESTATE OF JOANN LANDIS | 1/31/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00200 | THE ESTATE OF DAVID DENNEY | 1/31/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01789 | THE ESTATE OF CARL HARMAN | 1/30/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00136 | THE ESTATE OF DIANA LINDSEY | 1/30/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00128 | THE ESTATE OF EDMUND LEMONCELLI | 1/30/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL SUCCESSOR ADMIN; WITH WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00131 | THE ESTATE OF MARY REES | 1/29/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00130 | THE ESTATE OF MARK O'CONNOR | 1/29/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00167 | THE ESTATE OF CAROL DRISCOLL | 1/29/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00025 | THE ESTATE OF PHILLIP SISK | 1/26/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00102 | THE ESTATE OF GENE WEBB | 1/26/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2009EST01064 | THE ESTATE OF PATSY BEAUREGARD | 1/25/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00154 | THE ESTATE OF CHARLES BUNNING | 1/25/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00148 | THE ESTATE OF BOBBY GILL | 1/25/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00089 | THE ESTATE OF JEANNE TYREE | 1/24/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02451 | THE ESTATE OF NORMAN MAYBURY | 1/24/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01941 | THE ESTATE OF LUCILLE SCOTT | 1/23/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; WITH WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00055 | THE ESTATE OF BONNIE WALKER | 1/23/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2020EST00224 | THE ESTATE OF CHARLES BROOKS | 1/23/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 39, 40, 41 ... 989, 990, 991 Next |