19809 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2024EST00247 | THE ESTATE OF MABLE WATSON | 2/12/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01672 | THE ESTATE OF JOAN JAY | 2/12/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00210 | THE ESTATE OF RUBY ANDREWS | 2/12/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00193 | THE ESTATE OF LESTER MACK | 2/12/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00171 | THE ESTATE OF JERRY GARBER | 2/9/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00233 | THE ESTATE OF BARBARA ALLEN | 2/9/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00181 | THE ESTATE OF JOHN FALKENBACH | 2/9/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00092 | THE ESTATE OF TIMOTHY MALONEY | 2/9/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00180 | THE ESTATE OF ELBERT CLARK | 2/9/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00249 | THE ESTATE OF YVONNE AULTMAN | 2/9/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00160 | THE ESTATE OF PATRICIA REECE | 2/8/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01964 | THE ESTATE OF ANDREW STEVENSON | 2/8/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00125 | THE ESTATE OF TERRY SPARKS | 2/8/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00258 | THE ESTATE OF JANET CARRUTHERS | 2/7/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00245 | THE ESTATE OF WILLIAM RINGLEMAN | 2/7/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02459 | THE ESTATE OF DOROTHY BALLENGER | 2/6/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00221 | THE ESTATE OF JOHN GREER | 2/6/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00123 | THE ESTATE OF MARY SLUTERBECK | 2/5/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02123 | THE ESTATE OF DEBORAH HOERTT | 2/2/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 38, 39, 40 ... 989, 990, 991 Next |