19809 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2024EST00273 | THE ESTATE OF MARY EARLY | 2/20/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00224 | THE ESTATE OF LOUISE JOHNS | 2/20/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00327 | THE ESTATE OF CHARLES GILBERT | 2/20/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00217 | THE ESTATE OF ELMO BLANKEN | 2/20/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00320 | THE ESTATE OF LAWRENCE MCLEMORE | 2/16/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00278 | THE ESTATE OF MARGARET BYARS | 2/15/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02011 | THE ESTATE OF JOANNE TAYLOR | 2/15/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00300 | THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL BYRD | 2/15/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02491 | THE ESTATE OF RUSSELL YOUNG | 2/15/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02384 | THE ESTATE OF PENNY KRONAUGE | 2/15/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00191 | THE ESTATE OF KAYLA WILSON | 2/14/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02408 | THE ESTATE OF PATRICIA COLE | 2/14/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00197 | THE ESTATE OF TIMOTHY MCLAUGHLIN | 2/14/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00009 | THE ESTATE OF SHEILA PERRIN | 2/13/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00218 | THE ESTATE OF DANIEL DLABAY JR | 2/13/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00189 | THE ESTATE OF WILLIE TYSON | 2/12/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 37, 38, 39 ... 989, 990, 991 Next |