19809 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2024EST00463 | THE ESTATE OF JAMES BRAY | 3/4/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00435 | THE ESTATE OF JULIE JENKINS | 2/29/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00383 | THE ESTATE OF KELVIN CLEMENTS | 2/28/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00410 | THE ESTATE OF MAXINE HATFIELD | 2/28/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; WITH WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00139 | THE ESTATE OF SYLVIA TRITCH | 2/28/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00314 | THE ESTATE OF DONALD WALKER | 2/27/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00392 | THE ESTATE OF FAYE WHITE | 2/27/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00334 | THE ESTATE OF KEVIN YOUNG | 2/27/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00323 | THE ESTATE OF RUSSELL WATSON | 2/26/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01804 | THE ESTATE OF RAY JEFFERS JR | 2/26/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02196 | THE ESTATE OF ARTHUR ROSENFELDER JR. | 2/26/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00175 | THE ESTATE OF REBECCA LAMB | 2/26/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00336 | THE ESTATE OF JAMES MCLAUGHLIN | 2/26/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00375 | THE ESTATE OF THOMAS ARCHER | 2/23/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00178 | THE ESTATE OF SANDRA SPANGLER | 2/23/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00338 | THE ESTATE OF PHILLIP FENSEL | 2/22/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2022EST02173 | THE ESTATE OF MARIAN CAMPBELL | 2/22/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01792 | THE ESTATE OF LOIS ROBINSON | 2/22/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; WITH WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00328 | THE ESTATE OF DOLORES BAKER | 2/21/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 36, 37, 38 ... 989, 990, 991 Next |