19809 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2024EST00532 | THE ESTATE OF KEITH DISNEY | 3/18/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00488 | THE ESTATE OF WILLIAM SANDLIN | 3/15/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00471 | THE ESTATE OF DUNG NGUYEN | 3/15/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00455 | THE ESTATE OF SCOTT DOWNING | 3/15/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2022EST00282 | THE ESTATE OF RONALD CRAPYOU | 3/15/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; WITH WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00162 | THE ESTATE OF DANNY BOHANNON | 3/15/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00490 | THE ESTATE OF CHARIS BIVENS | 3/12/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00510 | THE ESTATE OF CATHY GUNSAULEY | 3/12/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01509 | THE ESTATE OF JAMES BUTLER | 3/11/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00496 | THE ESTATE OF MARILYN MARTEL | 3/11/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00457 | THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL DYE | 3/11/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00231 | THE ESTATE OF ALBERTA WARFORD | 3/8/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00461 | THE ESTATE OF ANNIE HARRIS | 3/8/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00436 | THE ESTATE OF STEVEN MILLER JR | 3/8/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00186 | THE ESTATE OF GERALDINE WELCH-HATT | 3/7/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; WITH WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00182 | THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL MCMANNIS | 3/6/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00332 | THE ESTATE OF BATON EMINI | 3/6/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00225 | THE ESTATE OF LUE COOPER | 3/5/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00404 | THE ESTATE OF DAVID WEBSTER | 3/5/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 35, 36, 37 ... 989, 990, 991 Next |