19809 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2024EST00598 | THE ESTATE OF ALBERT GRIFFIN | 3/28/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00617 | THE ESTATE OF CHARLES NIESS | 3/27/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02561 | THE ESTATE OF STEVEN CRABTREE | 3/27/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00519 | THE ESTATE OF CHARLES LEE WYATT | 3/26/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00166 | THE ESTATE OF JUDY HOUK | 3/26/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; WITH WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00571 | THE ESTATE OF WILLIAM CARTER | 3/26/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00594 | THE ESTATE OF JANE HALL | 3/26/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00212 | THE ESTATE OF RICHARD ISBILL | 3/25/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00376 | THE ESTATE OF BEVERLY NICHOLSON | 3/22/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00541 | THE ESTATE OF MARY PUGH | 3/21/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00209 | THE ESTATE OF WILLIAM FRYE | 3/21/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00545 | THE ESTATE OF LEWIS ALSTON | 3/21/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00144 | THE ESTATE OF JAMES OWENS | 3/20/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00483 | THE ESTATE OF PHYLLIS PRUITT | 3/20/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00538 | THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL ROGERS | 3/19/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00509 | THE ESTATE OF CAROLYN MAY | 3/19/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00395 | THE ESTATE OF GENEVA COLLINS | 3/19/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00389 | THE ESTATE OF GERALD SAYLOR | 3/18/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00532 | THE ESTATE OF KEITH DISNEY | 3/18/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 34, 35, 36 ... 989, 990, 991 Next |