19809 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2024EST00583 | THE ESTATE OF WANDA ALLEN | 4/12/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00634 | THE ESTATE OF WINSTON IVERSON SR | 4/11/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00677 | THE ESTATE OF JEROME TRICK | 4/10/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00649 | THE ESTATE OF PATRICIA WYATT | 4/10/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00620 | THE ESTATE OF VICKIE HUDSON | 4/9/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00586 | THE ESTATE OF DIANE NEWCOMB | 4/9/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00106 | THE ESTATE OF GERTIE MADEWELL | 4/9/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00670 | THE ESTATE OF JAMES POWERS | 4/9/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00499 | THE ESTATE OF JERALD MCCONNEL | 4/5/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00654 | THE ESTATE OF BRANDON TASTE | 4/3/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00625 | THE ESTATE OF JUDY STRAHL | 4/3/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00650 | THE ESTATE OF ANITA DAVIS | 4/2/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00662 | THE ESTATE OF THOMAS VINSON | 4/2/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02594 | THE ESTATE OF JOAN GRAY | 4/1/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00192 | THE ESTATE OF RUTH WILLIAMSON | 4/1/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00558 | THE ESTATE OF DOUGLAS WASSON | 4/1/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; WITH WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00578 | THE ESTATE OF GEORGE CARROLL | 3/29/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00615 | THE ESTATE OF KAREN TOMLIN | 3/29/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00599 | THE ESTATE OF PAUL BRANDENBURG JR | 3/29/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 33, 34, 35 ... 989, 990, 991 Next |