19807 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2024EST00777 | THE ESTATE OF JOHN POOLE | 4/24/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00793 | THE ESTATE OF LYNN MATHES | 4/24/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00360 | THE ESTATE OF LOWELL BATTEN | 4/24/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00707 | THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL FETTERS | 4/24/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00760 | THE ESTATE OF DANNY GEBHART | 4/24/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00776 | THE ESTATE OF VERNEDA SANDRIDGE | 4/23/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00393 | THE ESTATE OF JEANNE BOOMERSHINE | 4/22/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00750 | THE ESTATE OF JEFFERY ALLEN, III | 4/22/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL SUCCESSOR ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00621 | THE ESTATE OF JJ ARNOLD | 4/19/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00554 | THE ESTATE OF RITA MCDANIEL | 4/18/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00735 | THE ESTATE OF KATHLEEN BRENNAN | 4/18/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00727 | THE ESTATE OF JOHN CROUCH | 4/17/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00699 | THE ESTATE OF THOMAS SMYCZEK | 4/15/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00703 | THE ESTATE OF JOHN STANLEY | 4/15/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00701 | THE ESTATE OF TARSHA THOMPSON | 4/15/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00658 | THE ESTATE OF PHILLIP COMBS | 4/15/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00355 | THE ESTATE OF HARRY HOUPIS | 4/12/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00583 | THE ESTATE OF WANDA ALLEN | 4/12/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00659 | THE ESTATE OF MARK PERRINE | 4/12/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 32, 33, 34 ... 989, 990, 991 Next |