19807 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2024EST00877 | THE ESTATE OF JOSEPH KOELLER | 5/9/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00816 | THE ESTATE OF JANET MOWEN | 5/8/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00820 | THE ESTATE OF LISA KATZENBACH | 5/8/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00873 | THE ESTATE OF KATHY ADAMS | 5/7/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00827 | THE ESTATE OF ANNETTE THOMAS | 5/6/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00809 | THE ESTATE OF BEVERLY DUNSON | 5/6/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00815 | THE ESTATE OF ROBERT GIBSON | 5/2/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00837 | THE ESTATE OF WILLIAM OLIVER SR | 5/2/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00424 | THE ESTATE OF DANIEL STONE | 5/2/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00831 | THE ESTATE OF CHRISTOPHER HUGHES | 5/1/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00761 | THE ESTATE OF GEORGE GARTRELL | 5/1/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00642 | THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL O'DWYER | 4/30/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00795 | THE ESTATE OF CHARLES GRUBB | 4/30/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00646 | THE ESTATE OF SARAH LEHNHOFF | 4/26/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00611 | THE ESTATE OF CLARENCE HORSTMAN | 4/26/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00498 | THE ESTATE OF STACEY DONALD | 4/26/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00785 | THE ESTATE OF CRYSTAL LUGO | 4/26/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00798 | THE ESTATE OF KELLY RAYNEY | 4/26/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00531 | THE ESTATE OF ALLIE MELTON | 4/25/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 31, 32, 33 ... 989, 990, 991 Next |