Daily Law Journal
19807 Cases | Probate
Case Number Defendant Date
2024EST00914 THE ESTATE OF GARY FASNACHT 5/22/2024
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL
2024EST00915 THE ESTATE OF STEVEN FINFROCK 5/21/2024
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL
2014EST01750 THE ESTATE OF ETHEL CONYERS 5/20/2024
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; WITH WILL
2024EST00601 THE ESTATE OF BONNIE BAILEY 5/20/2024
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL
2024EST00588 THE ESTATE OF CHRISTINE BURNSIDE 5/17/2024
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL
2024EST00954 THE ESTATE OF TERESA VANEK 5/17/2024
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL
2024EST00857 THE ESTATE OF LUELLA WHITE 5/17/2024
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL
2024EST00946 THE ESTATE OF JEAN MILLS 5/16/2024
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL
2024EST00739 THE ESTATE OF CHIRAG PATEL 5/16/2024
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL
2023EST02356 THE ESTATE OF DOROTHY SCHRAM-PULTZ 5/16/2024
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL
2024EST00834 THE ESTATE OF JAMES LAWSON 5/15/2024
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL
2024EST00905 THE ESTATE OF DAIVD STOUTENBOROUGH 5/15/2024
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL
2024EST00909 THE ESTATE OF DEBORAH HOWARD 5/14/2024
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL
2024EST00728 THE ESTATE OF TEDDY FREEMAN 5/13/2024
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL
2024EST00911 THE ESTATE OF CAROL HODAPP 5/13/2024
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL
2024EST00755 THE ESTATE OF MATTIE LOVELESS 5/10/2024
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; WITH WILL
2024EST00868 THE ESTATE OF JAMES MERKINSON, SR. 5/10/2024
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL
2024EST00881 THE ESTATE OF SARA BARTUSCH 5/9/2024
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL
2024EST00804 THE ESTATE OF CLEMMIE HINES SR 5/9/2024
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; WITH WILL

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 30, 31, 32 ... 989, 990, 991  Next