19216 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2024EST00376 | THE ESTATE OF BEVERLY NICHOLSON | 3/22/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00209 | THE ESTATE OF WILLIAM FRYE | 3/21/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00541 | THE ESTATE OF MARY PUGH | 3/21/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00545 | THE ESTATE OF LEWIS ALSTON | 3/21/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00483 | THE ESTATE OF PHYLLIS PRUITT | 3/20/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00144 | THE ESTATE OF JAMES OWENS | 3/20/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00395 | THE ESTATE OF GENEVA COLLINS | 3/19/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00538 | THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL ROGERS | 3/19/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00509 | THE ESTATE OF CAROLYN MAY | 3/19/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00389 | THE ESTATE OF GERALD SAYLOR | 3/18/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00518 | THE ESTATE OF RONALD SLUTERBECK | 3/18/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00532 | THE ESTATE OF KEITH DISNEY | 3/18/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00359 | THE ESTATE OF ELBERT HALE | 3/18/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2022EST00282 | THE ESTATE OF RONALD CRAPYOU | 3/15/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; WITH WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00162 | THE ESTATE OF DANNY BOHANNON | 3/15/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00488 | THE ESTATE OF WILLIAM SANDLIN | 3/15/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00455 | THE ESTATE OF SCOTT DOWNING | 3/15/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00471 | THE ESTATE OF DUNG NGUYEN | 3/15/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00490 | THE ESTATE OF CHARIS BIVENS | 3/12/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3, 4, 5 ... 959, 960, 961 Next |