19807 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2024EST00973 | THE ESTATE OF FRANK ADAMS | 6/4/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2014EST01527 | THE ESTATE OF ALMA CRAWFORD | 6/3/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; WITH WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00771 | THE ESTATE OF PHILLIP COOPER | 6/3/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00966 | THE ESTATE OF GERALDINE GAINES | 6/3/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00967 | THE ESTATE OF JOANNE HIATT | 6/3/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01018 | THE ESTATE OF KAY SKAGGS | 5/31/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01046 | THE ESTATE OF COLBY ROSS | 5/31/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01039 | THE ESTATE OF CLARENCE WEATHERSBY | 5/30/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01019 | THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL MCGARRY | 5/30/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01010 | THE ESTATE OF PHYLLIS WILLIAMS | 5/29/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01024 | THE ESTATE OF CHAPPY PITTS | 5/29/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01001 | THE ESTATE OF SUSAN DIMATTEO | 5/29/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00984 | THE ESTATE OF RONALD RISMILLER | 5/28/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02461 | THE ESTATE OF CHERYL BILHEIMER | 5/28/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00758 | THE ESTATE OF JAMES JONES SR. | 5/28/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00878 | THE ESTATE OF WENDELL PUHR | 5/24/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00999 | THE ESTATE OF JOHNNIE BURNS | 5/23/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00989 | THE ESTATE OF WILLIAM GREIS | 5/23/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 29, 30, 31 ... 989, 990, 991 Next |