19805 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2024EST00297 | THE ESTATE OF PAUL TAKARA | 6/24/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00988 | THE ESTATE OF CAROL ISBILL | 6/24/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00689 | THE ESTATE OF EMILY HANSELMAN COX | 6/24/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01097 | THE ESTATE OF DAVID SAPHIRE | 6/24/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01169 | THE ESTATE OF JASHAUN KELLY | 6/24/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01199 | THE ESTATE OF MARY WALSH FALTA | 6/24/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01122 | THE ESTATE OF ELNA HORTON | 6/24/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; WITH WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01135 | THE ESTATE OF EDWARD WILKE | 6/21/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01159 | THE ESTATE OF ALICE HASTY | 6/20/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00489 | THE ESTATE OF GLENNA FOUST | 6/20/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01051 | THE ESTATE OF MONTANAE DAVIS | 6/20/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01184 | THE ESTATE OF ELEANOR PHILLIPS AXIOTES | 6/20/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01155 | THE ESTATE OF RICHARD DEITZ | 6/20/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01118 | THE ESTATE OF JON KENNEDY | 6/18/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00913 | THE ESTATE OF HARRY WHITE | 6/17/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01079 | THE ESTATE OF DONNA SMITH | 6/17/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02042 | THE ESTATE OF YVONNE GROSS | 6/17/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01156 | THE ESTATE OF DOUGLAS HANES | 6/17/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 26, 27, 28 ... 989, 990, 991 Next |