19805 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2024EST01254 | THE ESTATE OF DAVID WILLIAMS SR | 7/2/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL SUCCESSOR ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01242 | THE ESTATE OF JOAN SZABO | 7/1/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01166 | THE ESTATE OF MARGARET HICKS | 7/1/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01063 | THE ESTATE OF CAROL SUICH | 7/1/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01101 | THE ESTATE OF KATHERINE KRAFT | 7/1/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01238 | THE ESTATE OF NANCY HARTZELL | 7/1/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01245 | THE ESTATE OF KEITH PORTIS | 6/28/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01207 | THE ESTATE OF NORMA GEARHARDT | 6/28/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01062 | THE ESTATE OF KAYE LEHNHOFF | 6/28/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01240 | THE ESTATE OF PAUL HAMILTON | 6/28/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01189 | THE ESTATE OF KENNETH KINDRED | 6/28/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01228 | THE ESTATE OF BLAKE CADEN | 6/28/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01183 | THE ESTATE OF COLLIS EMMON | 6/27/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00039 | THE ESTATE OF MARK HODAPP | 6/27/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01217 | THE ESTATE OF MAXIE SALYER | 6/26/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01132 | THE ESTATE OF GEORGE DANGERFIELD, SR. | 6/26/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01126 | THE ESTATE OF PHILLIP SHOWALTER | 6/25/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01200 | THE ESTATE OF SANDRA MEFFORD | 6/25/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01199 | THE ESTATE OF MARY WALSH FALTA | 6/24/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 25, 26, 27 ... 989, 990, 991 Next |