Daily Law Journal
19805 Cases | Probate
Case Number Defendant Date
2024EST01299 THE ESTATE OF DON PAYNE 7/11/2024
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL
2024EST01262 THE ESTATE OF THOMAS NORRIS 7/10/2024
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL
2024EST01192 THE ESTATE OF JOANN PRETTYMAN 7/10/2024
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL
2024EST00974 THE ESTATE OF SHANNON CASEY 7/10/2024
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL
2000EST331830 THE ESTATE OF JONES, EDWARD GARFIELD, AKA 7/10/2024
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; WITH WILL
2024EST01277 THE ESTATE OF HAROLD HODGE 7/9/2024
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL
2024EST01290 THE ESTATE OF JUDITH MACY 7/9/2024
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL
2024EST01278 THE ESTATE OF JERRY BELLOMY 7/9/2024
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL
2024EST01315 THE ESTATE OF LORRI HOLMAN 7/9/2024
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL
2024EST00893 THE ESTATE OF PATRICIA TURNER 7/9/2024
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL
2024EST01256 THE ESTATE OF THADDEUS SMITH 7/8/2024
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL
2024EST01260 THE ESTATE OF ANTHONY MITCHELL 7/8/2024
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL
2024EST01259 THE ESTATE OF SHIRLEEN BRYSON 7/5/2024
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL
2024EST00828 THE ESTATE OF EVELYN TAYLOR YOUNG 7/5/2024
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; WITH WILL
2024EST01284 THE ESTATE OF VIVIAN POTEET 7/3/2024
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL
2024EST01223 THE ESTATE OF GARY PAUL 7/3/2024
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL
2024EST01235 THE ESTATE OF RICHARD HINKLE 7/2/2024
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL
2024EST01252 THE ESTATE OF HAROLD CALHOUN 7/2/2024
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 24, 25, 26 ... 989, 990, 991  Next