19803 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2024EST01473 | THE ESTATE OF VICKI RYAN | 9/16/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01560 | THE ESTATE OF REBA GROSS | 9/13/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01766 | THE ESTATE OF ELIZABETH BUSH | 9/13/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01749 | THE ESTATE OF LEANORA ROYSTER | 9/13/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01707 | THE ESTATE OF JEROME RILEY | 9/12/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01705 | THE ESTATE OF REBECCA BOWEN | 9/11/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01721 | THE ESTATE OF MAUREEN MOLONEY | 9/5/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01535 | THE ESTATE OF DUSTIN WILSON | 9/4/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01703 | THE ESTATE OF SHELLY HEDRICK | 9/3/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01420 | THE ESTATE OF GEBREMESKEL ABEGAZ | 9/3/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01689 | THE ESTATE OF RYAN WHITE | 9/3/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01699 | THE ESTATE OF TERESA FORMAN | 9/3/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01680 | THE ESTATE OF JANET COLLINS | 8/30/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01675 | THE ESTATE OF ELMA RODGERS | 8/29/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01629 | THE ESTATE OF IDA CAMP | 8/28/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01663 | THE ESTATE OF BILLIE TODD | 8/28/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01651 | THE ESTATE OF SHIRLENE AKERS | 8/28/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01583 | THE ESTATE OF GEORGE LEVI, SR. | 8/27/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; WITH WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01635 | THE ESTATE OF DORIS LANDIS | 8/27/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 19, 20, 21 ... 989, 990, 991 Next |