19803 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2024EST01846 | THE ESTATE OF JERRY GARVER | 9/25/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01702 | THE ESTATE OF SERENA HARRISON | 9/24/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01657 | THE ESTATE OF JEWEL BATES | 9/20/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01709 | THE ESTATE OF ROBERT HARPEST | 9/20/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01718 | THE ESTATE OF SALLY CLINGMAN | 9/20/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01740 | THE ESTATE OF JULIA PRINCE | 9/20/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01715 | THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL ALLEN | 9/19/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01732 | THE ESTATE OF VIRGIL ZINK | 9/19/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01745 | THE ESTATE OF BARBARA BROCKMAN | 9/19/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01791 | THE ESTATE OF SUSAN MALONE | 9/19/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01816 | THE ESTATE OF VONA PORTER | 9/19/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01795 | THE ESTATE OF ROBERT LODGE | 9/19/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00666 | THE ESTATE OF CAROL DIMATTEO | 9/18/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; WITH WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01775 | THE ESTATE OF DIANE LUDWIG | 9/18/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; WITH WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01742 | THE ESTATE OF EARL STAMPER | 9/18/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01684 | THE ESTATE OF GLENN STILES SR. | 9/17/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL SUCCESSOR ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01710 | THE ESTATE OF JOHN BRETELSON | 9/17/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01725 | THE ESTATE OF MARY DRISCOLL UNDERWOOD | 9/17/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00347 | THE ESTATE OF VELMA FANSLER | 9/17/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 18, 19, 20 ... 989, 990, 991 Next |