19807 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2012EST02504 | THE ESTATE OF ALMA DILLON | 12/27/2012 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2012EST02509 | THE ESTATE OF ALBERTA GIBSON | 12/27/2012 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2012EST02472 | THE ESTATE OF RALEIGH FRAZEE | 12/26/2012 | |||||||
EST: PROBATE ONLY & REL OF ADMIN | |||||||||
2012EST02507 | THE ESTATE OF MARTHA MOTE | 12/26/2012 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2012EST02489 | THE ESTATE OF MARTHA HEDGE | 12/24/2012 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIM WITHOUT WILL | |||||||||
2012EST02497 | THE ESTATE OF ROBERT COLUMBUS | 12/24/2012 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2012TRS00016 | THE TRUSTEESHIP OF KATHLEEN PICKETT | 12/21/2012 | |||||||
TRS: TESTATE TRUST | |||||||||
2012EST02487 | THE ESTATE OF SARGENT HUNT | 12/21/2012 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2012EST02484 | THE ESTATE OF OLE GILBO | 12/21/2012 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2012EST02478 | THE ESTATE OF RALPH SHROYER | 12/21/2012 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2012EST02488 | THE ESTATE OF BETTY JOHNSON | 12/21/2012 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIM WITHOUT WILL | |||||||||
2012EST02470 | THE ESTATE OF JANET WEBER | 12/21/2012 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2012GRD00037 | THE GUARDIANSHIP OF WILLIAM DOWNS | 12/21/2012 | |||||||
GRD: SUCCESSOR LIFE ESSENTIALS-INDIGENT | |||||||||
2012GRD00320 | THE GUARDIANSHIP OF DENNIS REINHARD | 12/21/2012 | |||||||
GRD: GUARDIANSHIP ADULT INCOMPETENT | |||||||||
2012EST02493 | THE ESTATE OF RONALD HOTOPP, SR. | 12/21/2012 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2012EST02473 | THE ESTATE OF OPAL CALICO | 12/21/2012 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2012EST02454 | THE ESTATE OF GLENN MORTON | 12/20/2012 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN NO WILL | |||||||||
2012EST02458 | THE ESTATE OF JOHN SQUIRES | 12/20/2012 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2012EST02464 | THE ESTATE OF DORTHA ULLERY | 12/20/2012 | |||||||
EST: PROBATE ONLY & REL OF ADMIN | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 910, 911, 912 ... 989, 990, 991 Next |