19770 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2024EST02157 | THE ESTATE OF RICHARD ROACH | 12/23/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST02164 | THE ESTATE OF BRIANNA MCCARTHY | 12/23/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST02401 | THE ESTATE OF LEWIS DEETER | 12/23/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST02241 | THE ESTATE OF WILLIAM LANDRUM | 12/20/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST02399 | THE ESTATE OF MARTA TEKLE | 12/20/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST02395 | THE ESTATE OF WILMA TACKETT | 12/20/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01467 | THE ESTATE OF RODRICK HARRISON SR. | 12/19/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST02354 | THE ESTATE OF DEBORAH ALFARO | 12/18/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST02387 | THE ESTATE OF SHARON BOWLING | 12/18/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST02257 | THE ESTATE OF MARTHA ARNDTS | 12/18/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; WITH WILL | |||||||||
2024EST02329 | THE ESTATE OF ESSIE TUCKER | 12/18/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST02383 | THE ESTATE OF BROCK ENDICOTT | 12/18/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST02199 | THE ESTATE OF BARBARA CARDER | 12/18/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST02309 | THE ESTATE OF CATHERINE PRASMANTAS | 12/17/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST02005 | THE ESTATE OF AUDELLA JOHNSON | 12/17/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST02376 | THE ESTATE OF JERRY REED | 12/16/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL SUCCESSOR ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST02366 | THE ESTATE OF THOMAS RUEBUSCH | 12/16/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 8, 9, 10 ... 987, 988, 989 Next |